+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: withdrawn.
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 21, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor