+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- Amended by APPROP - passed
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:27PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
June 24, 2022: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 6
June 23, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
March 17, 2022: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
March 17, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
February 2, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor