+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
- Senator Hatathlie motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1688 on Third Reading on March 7, 2024. Motion carried.
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Gowan flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2024: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 15
February 5, 2024: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor