+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Kerr flr amend (ref NREW) adopted
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 23, 2023: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 23, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 21, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
February 1, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor