+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass amended.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:27PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2022: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 16, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
February 2, 2022: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3