+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 296
- Action: Signed
On June 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- Transmit to House
On June 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
On June 19, 2007 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On June 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On June 7, 2007 in the House:
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
- House appointed: Biggs, Prezelski, Robson
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Verschoor, Gould, Rios
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: NRPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
2-16trans caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-18 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-9 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (8)
June 20, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
June 19, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
April 17, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 28, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 22, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor