+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- Rules
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Arzberger flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
3-6aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
Arzberger Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Arzberger Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor