+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On June 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On June 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate adopt
- Senate adopts conference committee
On June 12, 2007 in the House:
- House adopt
- House adopts conference committee
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
- House appointed: Anderson, Farnsworth, Thrasher
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Johnson, Gray L, Soltero
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to ED - Anderson
- Amendment: ED
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass amended
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Anderson SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the EDUCATION (K-12) Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
Anderson SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the EDUCATION (K-12) Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-12 ED K-12
Senate Fact Sheet
7-3edk-12_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
4-24 house changes
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 20, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
June 18, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2007: Education (K-12): Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2007: Education K-12: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4