+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 295
- Action: Signed
On June 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: GOV
- Amendment: Sub Floor Amend to GOV - Adams - failed by s/v 25-25. Passed after amending the COW report to include the Adams substitute floor amendment and exclude the GOV amendment.
- Motion to amend the Committee of the Whole report - Adams to include Adams Substitute Floor amendment to the GOV amendment and exclude the GOV amendment to the bill. Motion passed.: TRANSMIT TO SENATE: 06/20/07
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- COW motion
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Johnson flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Johnson flr amend #1 (ref Bill) (sub JUD)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Harper flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: McCune Davis flr amend (ref Bill)
- COW motion
- Leff to exclude johnson #2 flr amend
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (18)
Johnson Floor Amendment #1, reference to printed bill, substitute to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Adams SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the GOVERNMENT Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment #2, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment #1, reference to printed bill, substitute to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Adams SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the GOVERNMENT Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment #2, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
June 20, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 8
June 20, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2007: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor