+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Ugenti-Rita #2 flr amend (ref Bill) withdrawn
- Ugenti-Rita #1 flr amend (ref Bill) withdrawn
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
February 1, 2022: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor