+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 25
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Third read: Passed
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-16 approp_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
4-1 approp_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
3-16 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 16, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 15, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor