+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 24
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Alston
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Pancrazi
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Farley
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Kavanagh
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to APPROP - C Miranda
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Sinema flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Landrum Taylor flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Schapira flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment; reference to the Appropriations Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-16 approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-1 approp_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
4-8 approp_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
3-16 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 31, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 16, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor