+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Verschoor flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Verschoor flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Blendu flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Blendu flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Third read: Failed
- Motion
- Senator johnson motion to reconsider whereby failed to pass sb 1611 on third reading on march 8, 2007. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading on reconsideration
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Higher Education: Withdrawn
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Verschoor Floor Amendment #2, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Verschoor Floor Amendment #2, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment #2, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Verschoor Floor Amendment #1, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment #1, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2007: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2007: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2