+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Pearce flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Pearce flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Pearce flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 19
February 21, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor