+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 357 w/o
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Adams Sub Flr Amend to ERA - Kavanagh #2
- Amendment: ERA
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to ERA - Adams
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Adams Sub Flr Amnd to ERA - Kavanagh #1
- Amendment failed: Sub Flr to Kavanagh Fl#1 to Adams Sub to ERA - Pancrazi
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Adams Sub Flr Amend to ERA - Kavanagh #3
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Adams Sub Flr Amend to ERA - Meyer
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Adams Sub Flr Amend to ERA - Pancrazi
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Pancrazi to inlcude the Pancrazi Floor amend to the Adams Sub Floor Amend to the ERA Amend to the Bill
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Meyer to inlcude the Meyer Floor amend to the Adams Sub Floor Amend to the ERA Amend to the Bill
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (19)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Adams Substitute Floor Amendment to the Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Adams Substitute Floor Amendment to the Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Employment and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
March 8, 2011: Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
February 21, 2011: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3