+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pmobject
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
2-28 gr_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
2-15 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
February 2, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1