+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 294
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On June 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Pearce
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Health)
- Amendment adopted: O'Halleran flr amend (ref Health)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (17)
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to HEA amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to the Appropriations Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to HEA amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to the Appropriations Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
7-11 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
June 19, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
June 14, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
April 2, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
February 1, 2007: Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7