+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: BI
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to BI - Smith
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Proud #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Proud #2
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Goodale
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
- Motion to amend 2
- Motion to amend 2
- Committee of the Whole:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: BI (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
David Burnell Smith Floor Amendment; reference to the Banking and Insurance Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Proposed Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-14 bi_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
2-18 bi_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-11 bi
Senate Fact Sheet
3-14 bi_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 21, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor