+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pmobject
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
- House second read
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-18 health_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-15 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
February 2, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor