+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- House appointed: Mclain, Brophy Mcgee, Miranda R
- Final disposition: Held in conference committee
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- Senate appointed: Reagan, Aboud, Barto
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: BI
- Amendment failed: Sub Floor Amend to BI - Montenegro
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Banking and Insurance
House Proposed Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Proposed Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
House Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-14 hmlr_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Banking and Insurance
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
February 2, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor