+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Banking and Insurance: Held
- Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: BI (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Banking and Insurance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
February 2, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2