+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 275
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TRANS
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pmobject
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
4-19 approp_hosuechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
2-21 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 21, 2011: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 15, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 10, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor