+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
On June 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Amended by APPROP - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to APPROP - Livingston - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Payne - passed by s/v 31-29
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senator Hernandez motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1588 on Third Reading on March 16, 2023. Motion carried.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- MAPS (ref Bill) adopted
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref MAPS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (8)
June 13, 2023: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
June 12, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 21
March 28, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 28, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
March 27, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor