+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 19
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2023: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2