+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 168
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref PSHS)
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-15 pshs_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-18 pshs_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-10 pshs_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 2, 2011: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor