+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 31, 2022: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor