+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Failed to pass
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Murphy flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-3 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
3-1 ed_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2011: Education: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2011: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor