+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fann flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
- Second read in Senate.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 21, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4