+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pm
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2011: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
February 2, 2011: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor