+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 172
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-6 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
February 28, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2