+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
- Senator Alston motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1546 on Third Reading on March 20, 2023. Motion carried.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
March 20, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 16
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2023: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2