+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Second read in Senate.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
February 1, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor