+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: FAILED
- Senator Livingston motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1532 on Final Reading on May 27, 2021. Motion carried.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Pawlik to exclude the Udall flr amendment
- Amended by TRANS - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to TRANS - Udall - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:39PM.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 27, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
May 5, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
March 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
February 22, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor