+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 59
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Verschoor flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Verschoor Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Verschoor Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-6 health
Senate Fact Sheet
3-9aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor