+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 298
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
- Senate second read
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-20 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
5-10 approp_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
May 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 20, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor