+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 243
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: GOV
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to GOV - Mesnard
- Amendment passed: Flr Amnd to the Mesnard Sub Flr Amd to GOV - Mesnard
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Amendment:
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Antenori motion to amend COW report, carried
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (16)
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Substitute Floor Amendment to the Government Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment to the Mesnard Substitute Floor Amendment to the Government Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Mesnard Substitute Floor Amendment to the Government Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment to the Mesnard Substitute Floor Amendment to the Government Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2011: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor