+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 4, 2020: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 4, 2020: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor