+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 167
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandall flr amend (ref ED)
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-9 ed_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-13 ed_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
3-1 ed_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
April 12, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
March 2, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1