+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:02PM.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Mendez flr amend (ref Bill) failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
February 27, 2018: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 22, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor