+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: withdrawn.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
March 20, 2023: House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 14, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 2, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor