+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Held
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 am
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2-13 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2