+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 am
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-13 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
February 6, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1