+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: failed to pass.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2022: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 7
February 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
January 31, 2022: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor