+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in conference committee
- House appointed: Biggs, Mcclure, Prezelski
On June 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Verschoor, Gould, Rios
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to TRANS - Biggs
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: TRANS
On June 16, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Hale flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Arzberger flr amend (ref Bill) (sub TRANS)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs Substitute Floor Amendment to the Transporation Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Arzberger Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill; sub to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs Substitute Floor Amendment to the Transporation Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Arzberger Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill; sub to TRANS amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 25, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 25, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor