+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2016: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 2, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8