+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2007: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 30, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1