+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 132
- Action: Signed
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-18 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
2-29 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 20, 2008: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2008: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor