+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 274
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Finance: Withdrawn
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Gowan Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
2-16 bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
4-18 bsfss_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Gowan Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2011: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor