+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 125
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pm
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
2-15 bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
4-12 _bsfss_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2011: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 8, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor