+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by TRANS - Carroll - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:39PM.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 17, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
May 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
March 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 1, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor